Case: 04-89-00478-CV
04-89-00478-CV
10/02/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Kelvin Odoms
Leroy Batts & Hattie Batts
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/20/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/20/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/29/1990 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
06/29/1990 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
04/05/1990 | Submitted | | |
04/05/1990 | Submission | | |
04/05/1990 | Submitted | | |
03/30/1990 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
03/08/1990 | Submission | | |
02/23/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/23/1990 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
02/23/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/26/1989 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
10/26/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
10/02/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
10/02/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/30/1989 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
08/04/1989 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/20/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
285th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable John J. Specia
89-PA-00574
n/a