judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BEN Z. GRANT v. JIM AMMERMAN, ET AL.

Case: B-1222
B-1222
11/18/1968
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
BEN Z. GRANT
JIM AMMERMAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/21/1969Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
02/20/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/18/1968Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/16/1968Supplemental Brief filedRelator
12/04/1968Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
12/04/1968Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
12/04/1968Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/24/1969Response to Motion filed
02/21/1969Brief in Support of Petition
02/20/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/12/1969Order from Lower Court filed
02/05/1969Opinion issued
12/18/1968Brief on the Merits
12/16/1968Affidavit filed
12/16/1968Supplemental Brief filed
12/04/1968Brief in Support of Petition
12/04/1968Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/04/1968Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
11/25/1968Response to Motion filed
11/18/1968Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jim Ammerman, et al.Respondent
Ben Z. GrantRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information