judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

US DEP'T OF HOMELAND SECURITY V. RAHEEL JOHRI

Case Information: 10-AA-1548
Short Caption:US DEP'T OF HOMELAND SECURITY V. RAHEEL JOHRIClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02415-10Filed Date:12/17/2010

Opening Event Date:12/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/04/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerUnited States Department of Homeland SecurityN
Jennifer Ashworth KendrickNY
R. Craig LawrenceNY
RespondentRaheel Johri NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/17/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (No fee due filed by Homeland Security).
12/17/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
12/27/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
03/17/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ hearing of 11/9/10
03/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/21/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/23/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO LAWRENCE
05/02/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/6/11
05/05/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
05/27/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
05/27/2011ORDER DENY AS MOOT PTNR MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF
05/27/2011DISMISSED
08/04/2011FiledMandate