judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RANGE (KINGSTON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36346
Short Caption:RANGE (KINGSTON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C161263XClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/29/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-10882
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: June 21, 2000. 00-10883
07/07/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-11577
07/07/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/27/00; Trial Commencing 3/27/00 and Ending 3/31/00; 5/22/00. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 00-11578
10/18/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 18, 2000. 00-18443
10/26/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/27/00 (2); 3/28/00; 3/29/00; 3/30/00; and 3/31/00. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 00-18912
11/21/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-20419
11/21/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-20420
12/15/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 29, 2000; March 30, 2000; May 22, 2000. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 00-21938
12/19/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-22095
02/08/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
05/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-08897
05/29/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
08/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-13627
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13846
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2001. 01-13846