judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8753
C-8753
06/12/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
ROBERT ELLIS STRIPLIN JR.
THE EIGHTH COURT OF APPEALS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/21/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/03/1989Case StoredNO REEHARING FILED
07/25/1989Relator's reply brief
07/12/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
06/21/1989Reply to Response
06/12/1989Exhibits received
06/12/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
06/12/1989No description available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/03/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
08-89-00144-CV
Denied
___ Sw2d ___, 04-27-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information