judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00586-CV
01-89-00586-CV
06/09/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Bunch, Judy Mitchell
Chaney, Warren L.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/03/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/03/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/23/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
06/08/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/10/1990Submitted
04/10/1990Submission
04/10/1990Submitted
02/06/1990Submission
10/02/1989Filing fee paid
09/08/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/08/1989Case ready to be set
09/08/1989Case ready to be set
08/17/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
08/03/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/18/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/12/1989Notice of dismissal
06/15/1989Supplemental transcript filed
06/09/1989Transcript filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/25/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/03/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeTheo W. Pinson
StateAppellantHugh L. Scott, Jr.
Trial Court Information
129th District Court
Harris
87-26551