judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00557-CV
01-89-00557-CV
06/09/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
HBA East, Ltd., et al
JEA Boxing Company, Inc., et al
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/17/1991Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
05/16/1991Motion to recall mandate disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
05/07/1991Motion to recall mandate
04/15/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/15/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/01/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
02/20/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
01/23/1991Writ disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
11/15/1990Submitted
11/15/1990Submission
11/15/1990Submitted
10/22/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
10/18/1990Date final opinion release for publication
10/16/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
10/08/1990Writ filed
10/05/1990Writ filed
09/06/1990Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
09/06/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/06/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/06/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/28/1990Motion for rehearing filed
08/21/1990Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
08/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/16/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/13/1990Motion strans disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
08/10/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
08/06/1990Motion for leave to file strans
11/21/1989Supplemental brief filed
10/30/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/20/1989Statement of facts filed
10/12/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/12/1989Motion to extend time to file sup brief dispGrant motion
10/12/1989Supplemental brief filed
10/02/1989Motion to extend time to file sup brief
09/29/1989Filing fee paid
09/29/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
08/31/1989Motion to adavance appeal disposedGrant motion
08/25/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
08/24/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
08/23/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
08/21/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
08/16/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
08/10/1989Filing fee paid
07/31/1989Filing fee paid
07/28/1989Statement of facts filed
07/26/1989Transcript filed
07/14/1989Filing fee paid
06/09/1989Motion to advance or accelerate appeal filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeHarold Dixon Montague
StateAppellantJoe C. Holzer
StateAppelleeMarie R. Yeates
StateAppellantHon. Marilyn J. Wright
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
87-010167