judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00588-CR
01-89-00588-CR
06/09/1989
Other Felony
Cosmi, Traian Daniel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/17/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/17/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/28/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
04/13/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
03/29/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
03/29/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
03/13/1990Motion to dismiss appeal
12/14/1989Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
09/05/1989Brief due for retained counsel
07/31/1989Transcript filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/06/1989Notice of appeal filed
06/01/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/17/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantMassey LeRoy Peavy
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
506024
35 years TDC