judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00153-CR
02-89-00153-CR
06/09/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Parker, Dennis Leon
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/17/1991Mandate Issued
03/06/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
12/28/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
11/27/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/02/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/17/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/09/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/27/1990Submitted
06/27/1990Submission
06/13/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
05/31/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/14/1990Motion Filed
05/14/1990Order Entered
04/17/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1990No Description Available.
04/02/1990Motion Filed
03/21/1990Brief Filed
02/26/1990Exhibits Filed
02/20/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/26/1990Brief Filed
01/26/1990Submission
01/11/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/08/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/06/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
09/14/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/14/1989Exhibits Filed
08/14/1989No Description Available.
06/12/1989No Description Available.
06/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/17/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Parker, Dennis LeonCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
30th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Calvin Ashley
26,212-A
15 yrs., TDC