judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY V. KATREMA DANIELS

Case Information: 10-CV-1515
Short Caption:NATIONWIDE AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY V. KATREMA DANIELSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAV5650-08Filed Date:11/23/2010

Opening Event Date:11/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/10/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/24/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/16/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNationwide Affinity Insurance CompanyN
Earnest Franklin, Jr.YN
AppelleeKatrema Daniels N
Peter A. Chapin YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/08/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension time to file proof of transcript order and statement of issues aplt intends to present on appeal (opp) (elp)
12/15/2010APPELLANT'S PROOF OF TRANSCRIPT *Construed as the STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/25/10) (elp)
12/15/2010STATEMENT OF ISSUE(S) aplt
01/03/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 23, 2010, and appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the statement regarding transcript, and statement of issues, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged proof of transcript order, it is (MORE)
01/03/2011 ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted and the lodged proof of transcript order is filed as the Statement Regarding Transcript. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index and transcripts required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
01/11/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Peter Chaplin
03/07/2011RECORD INDEX
03/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#! (57-PGS/tape 10/25/10 proc.)w/cd
03/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 9, 2011 (unopposed)
04/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before May 9, 2011. (JAC) elp
05/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 5/16/11
05/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before May 16, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/16/2011APPENDIX
06/10/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/10/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/16/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
06/30/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/12/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
10/18/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/24/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Steadman
01/24/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
02/16/2012FiledMandate