judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HADJIGHASEMI VS. WEISE

Case Information: 33502
Short Caption:HADJIGHASEMI VS. WEISECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9401093AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/12/1999 / Yott, LaurieSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Geoffrey Roullard--check no. 2426.
12/22/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00478
01/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
01/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00086
01/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Carson City Legal Clinic--check no. 1572.
01/12/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie A. Yott. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/22/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. from counsel for appellant/cross-respondent. 99-00439
01/25/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service/Docketing Statement. 99-00485
02/12/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. For respondent/cross-appellant. Mailed on: hand delivered 2/12/99-Reno/Carson Messenger. 99-00996
02/19/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-01156
02/19/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-01157
02/26/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." NRAP 42(b). NNP 99-01305
02/26/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.