judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8746
C-8746
06/12/1989
App Writ Err (2) Originally filed as 130(d)
CUBILLA CONDOMINIUM CORPORATION N.V. AND FIDINAM (U.S.A.)
DAVID WILSON MCCREA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/03/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentCUBILLA'S REPLY TO MCCREA
07/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#2: DAVID MCCREA
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/07/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
11/15/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#1 - CUBILLA CONDOMINIUM
11/15/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#2 - MCCREA
08/29/1989Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See RemarksTO RESP. ATTY. EXPLAINING $50.00 CHG FOR M/E/T TO FILE APPL. AND FOR APPLICATION IN REPLY TO LETTER OF INQUIRY.
08/09/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/09/1989No description available.
08/03/1989Reply to ResponseCUBILLA'S REPLY TO MCCREA
07/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#2: DAVID MCCREA
06/27/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedON BEHALF OF DAVID MCCREA
06/26/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filedMCCREA'S 130(D) FWD TO CENTRAL
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/07/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
01-86-00842-CV
Reversed and Remanded
769 SW2d 261, 12-15-88
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Ben G. Levy
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
Honorable Ann Tyrrell Cochran
82-50522