judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00279-CV
04-89-00279-CV
06/09/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
David D. Smith
Timothy Turner
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/18/1990Mandate Issued
07/18/1990Mandate Issued
07/05/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
05/30/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
05/10/1990Information regarding cause received
04/20/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/18/1990Writ of Error filed
04/11/1990Information regarding cause received
03/30/1990Information regarding cause received
02/28/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/08/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/24/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/24/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/24/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/13/1989Submitted
12/13/1989Submission
12/13/1989Submitted
11/14/1989Submission
10/03/1989Case ready to be set
10/03/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/1989Case ready to be set
10/02/1989Requests Oral Argument
10/02/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
10/02/1989Brief Filed
09/19/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/30/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/09/1989Requests Oral Argument
08/09/1989Brief Filed
07/19/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/07/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/09/1989No Description Available.
06/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/06/1989No Description Available.
05/24/1989Appeal Bond Filed
02/24/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
45th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raul Rivera
87-CI-22149
n/a