judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0844-89
PD-0844-89
06/12/1989
PDR Case Type
JENKINS, EX PARTE ERNEST LEO, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/25/1989BRIEF FILEDState
08/28/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/09/1990MANDATE ISSD
02/21/1990OPINION ISSDDismissed
01/17/1990SUBMITTED
01/17/1990SUBMITTED
12/21/1989SET FOR SUBMIS
09/25/1989BRIEF FILED
08/28/1989BRIEF FILED
08/28/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
08/28/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
07/26/1989PDR DISPGranted
06/12/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/09/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
JENKINS, EX PARTE ERNEST LEO,Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)James M. Leitner
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-89-00147-CR
Aff 5-4-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable Norman Lanford
519058