judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0847-89
PD-0847-89
06/12/1989
PDR Case Type
WARD, ERNEST
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/06/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/13/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/12/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ward, ErnestApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Michael P. Fosher
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00931-CR
Aff 5-18-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable DOUG SHAVER
508869