judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0846-89
PD-0846-89
06/12/1989
PDR Case Type
COCHRAN, HAROLD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/27/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/13/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/12/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cochran, HaroldApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Stanley F. Swenson
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00894-CR
Aff 5-4-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable Norman Lanford
498828