judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN LOUIS STARK V. FLETCHER MILNE STARK

Case Information: 10-CV-1514
Short Caption:JOHN LOUIS STARK V. FLETCHER MILNE STARKClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7737-09Filed Date:11/30/2010

Opening Event Date:11/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/02/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/07/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/17/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Louis Stark N
Eugene I. Kane, Jr.YY
AppelleeFletcher Milne Stark N
Roy I. NiedermayerYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 30, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
01/05/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT and statement (Titled as: motion for extension and acceptance of statement out of time)
01/05/2011RECEIVED- aplt's statement regarding transcript and statement of issues
01/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, and statement of issues out of time, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript and statement of issues are filed. It is (MORE)
01/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) *attached to statement of issues
01/24/2011STATEMENT OF ISSUE(S) *attached to the statement regarding transcript
01/24/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
02/02/2011RECORD INDEX
02/02/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 7 days
03/28/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief w/Appendix attached
04/06/2011RECEIVED - ltr to counsel for aple re inaccurate cert of service on aplt's mot for ext of time.
04/06/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's motion for extension of time to file brief
04/11/2011RECEIVED - amended certificate of service regarding aplt's brief
04/18/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix, the opposition, thereto, and the lodged brief and the letter from counsel for appellee, and appellant's amended certificate of service, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of appellant and the appendix. It is (MORE)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/18/2011APPENDIX - (Attached to Appellant's Brief)
04/18/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW) elp
05/02/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/02/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/13/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/07/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, Ferren
03/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
04/17/2012FiledMandate