judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZEBEDIAH WILLIAM HARRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0257)
Case Number:S-10-0257Case Docketed On:12/09/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ZEBEDIAH WILLIAM HARRIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ZEBEDIAH WILLIAM HARRIS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantZebediah William HarrisDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/09/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/25/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/26/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/08/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
03/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/09/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal