judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITTINGHILL VS. STATE

Case Information: 33501
Short Caption:WHITTINGHILL VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980217Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/25/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/22/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00477
12/30/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court Docket Entries. Due Date: 10 days
02/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-01002
02/25/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 99-01299
02/25/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-02989
05/12/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 99-03835
05/12/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/26/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 18, 1999. 99-03835
05/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On April 16, 1999, this court entered an order dismissing this appeal. On April 29, 1999, appellant submitted a proper person motion for the appointment of counsel and a proper person opening brief. The clerk shall return unfiled appellant's proper person documents. 99-04346
05/26/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Motion for Appointment of Counsel. 99-03402
05/26/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Opening Brief to Include Issues for Perfection of Appeal. 99-03403