judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8748
C-8748
06/12/1989
App Writ of Error
J. H. STRAIN and HALF MOON LAND & CATTLE INC.
BEVERLY SMITH STOELTJE BAUMAN and BARBARA SMITH ROBINSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/22/1989Motion for RehearingPetitionerRULE 5, ENVELOPE
06/21/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/10/1989Case StoredREHEARING OVERRULED
11/08/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
09/28/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
09/22/1989Motion for RehearingRULE 5, ENVELOPE
09/06/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
06/21/1989Case forwarded to Court
06/21/1989No description available.
06/21/1989Reply to Response
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/10/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
11-88-00211-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 03-30-89
11th Court of Appeals
Honorable W. G. ARNOT
Trial Court Information
32nd District Court
Fisher
Honorable Weldon Kirk
4606