judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8743
C-8743
06/12/1989
See former TRAP 130(D)
RAYMOND L. RAINS DONALD W. MOORE AL CURRY & TIM CURRY
DAVID M. COHEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/21/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentREPLY OF RAYMOND L. RAINS, ET AL
07/06/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP FILED BY DAVID M. COHEN
06/26/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/02/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
10/11/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedON BEHALF OF RAYMOND L. RAINS ET AL.
10/11/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedON BEHALF OF DAVID M. COHEN
07/26/1989Case forwarded to Court
07/26/1989No description available.
07/21/1989Reply to ResponseREPLY OF RAYMOND L. RAINS, ET AL
07/06/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP FILED BY DAVID M. COHEN
06/29/1989Reply to M/E/T to file App Writ Err
06/27/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling granted
06/26/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filedDAVID M. COHEN'S
06/26/1989Reply to Response
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/02/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
02-87-00115-CV
Reversed and Remanded
769 SW2d 380, 04-27-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable Harry Hopkins
Trial Court Information
352nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable John G. Street
352-7898l-83