judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0840-89
PD-0840-89
06/12/1989
PDR Case Type
PHIFER, GEORGE DAVID
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/05/1990BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/09/1989BRIEF WAIVEDState Prosecuting Attorney
07/10/1989RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/27/1990MANDATE ISSD
04/11/1990OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
01/17/1990SUBMITTED
01/17/1990SUBMITTED
01/05/1990BRIEF FILED
01/05/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
01/05/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
12/22/1989NO BRIEF FILED
12/21/1989SET FOR SUBMIS
12/04/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/04/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
11/08/1989NO BRIEF FILED
10/09/1989BRIEF WAIVED
09/27/1989PDR DISPGranted
07/10/1989RESPONSE FILED
06/12/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/27/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateRobert A. Huttash
F. Duncan Thomas
Phifer, George DavidApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Peter S. Chamberlain
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00080-CR
Rev & Rem 4-26-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
354th District Court
Hunt
Honorable PAUL BANNER
14,736