judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8758
C-8758
06/12/1989
App Writ of Error
WILLIAM R. CREE
SLATON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/12/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentON BEHALF OF CITY OF SLATON
06/27/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentSLATON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/28/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REEHARING FILED
09/06/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
07/13/1989Case forwarded to Court
07/13/1989No description available.
07/12/1989Reply to ResponseON BEHALF OF CITY OF SLATON
06/27/1989MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedBEHALF/CITY OF SLATON, HIGH PLAINS WATER DIST., LUBB.CO.HOSP.DIST.,LUBBOCK CO., STATE OF TX, & LUB.CEN.APP.DIST.
06/27/1989Reply to ResponseSLATON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/28/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
LUBBOCK COUNTY HOSPITAL DIST.RespondentMr. David A. Ellison
CITY OF SLATONRespondentMr. David A. Ellison
LUBBOCK CENTRAL APPRAISALRespondentMr. David A. Ellison
HIGH PLAINS WATER DISRICTRespondentMr. David A. Ellison
COUNTY OF LUBBOCKRespondentMr. David A. Ellison
Court of Appeals Information:
07-88-00067-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 03-14-89
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
137th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Cecil G. Puryear
85-727182