judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8755
C-8755
06/12/1989
App Writ of Error
JOSEPH BORDEN TRUSTEE
EVA SCHWARTZ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/20/1989Motion for RehearingPetitionerFAXED COPY; ORIG + 11 ON THE WAY
06/19/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentAPPELLEE'S BRIEF FROM THE COA
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/11/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
10/11/1989Record returned to Court of Appeals
09/28/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
09/21/1989Brief filed that is difficult to read due to color
09/20/1989Motion for RehearingFAXED COPY; ORIG + 11 ON THE WAY
09/06/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
06/21/1989Case forwarded to Court
06/21/1989No description available.
06/19/1989Reply to ResponseAPPELLEE'S BRIEF FROM THE COA
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/13/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
Dismissed [duplicate 1]
Rule 90, 04-06-89
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable PAUL PRESSLER
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
87-43647