judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8750
C-8750
06/12/1989
App Writ of Error
DEE FORGY d/b/a FORGY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
CITY OF SAN ANTONIO and CITY WATER BOARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/04/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
11/27/1989Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/27/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/21/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
12/20/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
12/04/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
11/30/1989Motion for Rehearing forwardedBOXED RECORD IN CLERK'S OFFICE
11/27/1989Motion for Rehearing
11/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
06/28/1989Case forwarded to Court
06/28/1989No description available.
06/27/1989Reply to Response
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/21/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00092-CV
Reversed & Rendered
769 Sw2d 293, 03-22-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
150th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Fred Biery
86-CI-21469