judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8744
C-8744
06/12/1989
Second App Writ Error
TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT AND TARRANT APPRAISAL REVIEW
COLONIAL COUNTRY CLUB
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/11/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondentBEHALF/COLONIAL COUNTRY CLUB.
12/07/1989Motion for RehearingPetitionerBEHALF/TARRANT APPRAISAL & TARRANT APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD
06/27/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentCOLONIAL COUNTRY CLUB
06/27/1989Reply to ResponsePetitionerTO RESP'S COND APP
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP N0#1: TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/19/1990Phone call from Clerk's OfficeTO ATTYS, HOWETH & ALDER, RE MO. TO WITHDRAW -- INDICATED THEY SHOULD FILE WITH COURT OF APPEALS.NO ACTION BY SCT.
03/26/1990Motion to Withdraw Filed
03/26/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
03/21/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
03/16/1990Notice requesting filing fee
12/13/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
12/11/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedBEHALF/COLONIAL COUNTRY CLUB.
12/07/1989Motion for RehearingBEHALF/TARRANT APPRAISAL & TARRANT APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD
11/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#1 - TARRANT APPRAISAL DIST.
11/22/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#2 - COLONIAL COUNTRY CLUB
06/28/1989Case forwarded to Court
06/28/1989No description available.
06/27/1989Reply to ResponseCOLONIAL COUNTRY CLUB
06/27/1989Reply to ResponseTO RESP'S COND APP
06/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP N0#1: TARRANT APPRAISAL DISTRICT
06/12/1989Conditional application for writ of error filedCOND APP: COLONIAL COUNTRY CLUB
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/26/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
02-87-00224-CV
As Modified, Affirmed
___SW2d___, 03-08-89
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable DAVID FARRIS
Trial Court Information
17th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Claude Williams
17-94831-86