judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROCK (KAREEM) VS. STATE C/W 33575

Case Information: 33518
Short Caption:BROCK (KAREEM) VS. STATE C/W 33575Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:33518*, 33575 Related Case(s): 50242 , 69696 , 69696-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C136356Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/04/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/28/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00525
12/31/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 98-00581
02/04/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 2/2/99. 99-00813
02/04/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/09/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order due: 30 days from the date of this order. 99-11049
12/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 12/14/99. 99-12883
07/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we concude that the relief requested is not warranted. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 33518, 33575. 00-12156
08/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13815
08/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13815