judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VIC AND JANE GARBER; SANDRA LANGE, Trustee of the Sandra K. Lange Trust; FRED AND WENDY LARSON; FRED SMITH; MICHAEL AND NITA WERNER; ROSS AND BIFF GORMAN; DR. KIRBY KIRKLAND; and DAVE AND GLYNDA EDWARDS v. WAGONHOUND LAND AND LIVESTOCK COMPANY, LLC; VENJOHN OIL, INC., and STEVEN M. VENJOHN

Case Heading (S-11-0006)
Case Number:S-11-0006Case Docketed On:01/06/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:VIC AND JANE GARBER; SANDRA LANGE, Trustee of the Sandra K. Lange Trust; FRED AND WENDY LARSON; FRED SMITH; MICHAEL AND NITA WERNER; ROSS AND BIFF GORMAN; DR. KIRBY KIRKLAND; and DAVE AND GLYNDA EDWARDS v. WAGONHOUND LAND AND LIVESTOCK COMPANY, LLC; VENJOHN OIL, INC., and STEVEN M. VENJOHN
Full Title:VIC AND JANE GARBER; SANDRA LANGE, Trustee of the Sandra K. Lange Trust; FRED AND WENDY LARSON; FRED SMITH; MICHAEL AND NITA WERNER; ROSS AND BIFF GORMAN; DR. KIRBY KIRKLAND; and DAVE AND GLYNDA EDWARDS, Appellants (Petitioners), v. WAGONHOUND LAND AND LIVESTOCK COMPANY, LLC; VENJOHN OIL, INC., and STEVEN M. VENJOHN, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVic GarberHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantJane GarberHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantSandra LangeHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantFred LarsonHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantWendy LarsonHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantFred SmithHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantMichael WernerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantNita WernerHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantRoss GormanHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantBiff GormanHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantKirby KirklandHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantDave EdwardsHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppellantGlynda EdwardsHarriet M. Hageman
Kara B. Fornstrom
AppelleeWagonhound Land and Livestock Company, LLCRobert G. Berger
Mistee Lyn Elliott
AppelleeVenjohn Oil, Inc.
AppelleeSteven M. Venjohn

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Water Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 89
Citation:279 P.3d 525 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/06/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2011Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
02/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' opening brief; and statement of costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record on appealNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/11/2011Brief - Appellee - Wagonhound Land and Livestock Company, LLCBriefAppelleeFinal
04/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Wagonhound Land & Livestock Company, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/13/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellees Venjohn Oil Inc., and Steven M. VenjohnBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
04/29/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/10/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/11/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/11/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, ten volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts; Volumes VI-IX, Agency Record; Volume X, Oversized Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Harriet M. Hageman for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2011Order - Assignment of judge - Kenneth E. Stebner, Retired District Judge, assigned to act in this matter for Justice Voigt who is recused.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
05/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mistee Godwin for appellee Wagonhound Land & Livestock.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/14/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/14/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke, and Stebner, DJ Retired (Harriet M. Hageman for Appellants; Mistee Lyn Godwin for Appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/22/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/10/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/10/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/12/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/11/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/13/2012Record - Other - Counsel for appellants picked up Volume X, oversized exhibits.RecordOtherFinal