judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORA VS. STATE

Case Information: 33517
Short Caption:MORA VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR972809Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/24/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/24/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00514
02/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1-We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-01143
03/17/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01925
03/17/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/23/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 19, 1999. 99-01925