judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIMBERLY SHAFFER v. WINHEALTH PARTNERS

Case Heading (S-11-0005)
Case Number:S-11-0005Case Docketed On:01/06/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:KIMBERLY SHAFFER v. WINHEALTH PARTNERS
Full Title:KIMBERLY SHAFFER, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. WINHEALTH PARTNERS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKimberly ShafferBlair J. Trautwein
AppelleeWINhealth PartnersMichael B. Rosenthal
Lucas Evan Buckley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2011 WY 131
Citation:261 P.3d 708

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/06/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Kimberly ShafferEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/06/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee, Winhealth Partners; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Blair J. Trautwein for appellant; Michael Rosenthal for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/06/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/25/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Blair J. Trautwein for appellant; Lucas Evan Buckley, Michael B. Rosenthal, argument by Mr. Rosenthal for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/25/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/20/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the Court, Justice Golden filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Voigt joined, Justice Voigt filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Golden joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/06/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/06/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/12/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/11/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal