judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOC. V. SOLERS, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1523
Short Caption:SOFTWARE & INFORMATION INDUSTRY ASSOC. V. SOLERS, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB3779-05Filed Date:12/01/2010

Opening Event Date:12/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/17/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/03/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppellantBusiness Software AllianceN
Andrew G. Mcbride NN
Amicus-AppellantWashington PostN
Kevin T. Baine NN
Amicus-AppellantMaryland Delaware District of Columbia Press AsscnN
Kevin T. Baine NN
AppellantSoftware & Information Industry AssociationN
Leo Rydzewski NN
Charles D. TobinYY
AppelleeSolers Inc.N
Daniel J. TobinYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (Amended NOA filed 12/16/10)
12/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 1, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
12/27/2010RECORD INDEX
12/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/14/2011APPENDIX
02/17/2011AMICUS CURIAE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (Washington Post and Maryland Delaware-District for Columbia Press Assoc.)
02/17/2011RECEIVED - Amicus Curiae Brief (Washington Post and Maryland-Delaware-District of Columbia Press Assoc.)
02/22/2011AMICUS CURIAE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (Business Software Alliance)
02/22/2011RECEIVED- brief of amicus curiae
02/24/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to amicus curiae motion for leave to file amicus brief
02/25/2011TMC - motionS for leave to file (LODGED) amicus briefs - oppo - reply
03/01/2011INTERVENOR'S REPLY in support of BSA motion for leave to appear as amicus curiae
03/14/2011 ORDERED that the MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEFS AS AMICUS CURIE ARE GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged and enter Business Software Alliance, The Washington Post and Maryland Delaware District of Columbia Press Association as amicus curiae on behalf of appellant. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed w/n 30 daus from the date of this order. (RDKRTE) (rm)
03/14/2011AMICI CURIAE'S BRIEF -THE WASHINGTON POST & THE MARYLAND-DELEWARE-DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PRESS ASSOCIATION
03/14/2011AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF -BUSINESS SOFTWARE ALLIANCE
04/13/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/13/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
05/09/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/17/2011FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Reid, Farrell
01/12/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (MOJ) (Fisher, Associate Judge, and farrell and Reid, Senior Judges*.)
02/03/2012FiledMandate