judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JENSEN (THOMAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33516
Short Caption:JENSEN (THOMAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48515
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR980483Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/09/2000 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/09/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/24/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/24/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00513
12/29/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00554
12/29/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: October 5, 1998 through October 9, 1998 (Jury Trial), November 24, 1998 (sentencing); September 29, 1998 (hearing on pre-trial motions). To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting. 98-00555
12/29/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. d.c. docket entries, judgment filed 11/24/98. Due Date: 10 days
01/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: November 24, 1998. 99-00073
01/13/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. October 6, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Debora L. Cecere. 99-00227
01/20/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Motions 9/29/98. Court Reporter: Debora L. Cecere. 99-00384
01/22/1999MotionFiled Motion. Request of Court Reporter for Extension of Time to File Appeal Transcript. 99-00460
01/26/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 10/07/98 and 11/24/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Wendy L. Pearson. 99-00527
01/26/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 10/08/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Gail West-Willsey. 99-00528
01/26/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 10/08/98 and 10/09/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Constance S. Eisenber. 99-00529
02/09/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Jury Trial--10/5/98. Court Reporter: Corrie L. Wolden. 99-00892
02/18/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The transcript of the jury trial conducted on October 5, 1998, was filed in this court on February 9, 1999. The January 22, 1999 request for an extension of time to file the transcript is denied as moot. 99-01091
04/26/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 6/1/99. 99-03251
06/01/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-04537
06/14/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Permission to be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Appellant. 99-05115
08/10/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time, but deny counsel's motion to be relieved. Appellant shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-07378
08/30/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 8/30/99. 99-08140
08/30/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 4. 99-08141
09/30/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 99-09395
11/02/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-10639
12/01/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-11953
02/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 4, 1999, appellant submitted a proper person motion for the withdrawal of this attorney and the transfer of all legal documents. The same day, attorney Cornell submitted a response to the motion. fn1[Appellant's current appellate counsel did not represent appellant in any stage of the district court proceedings which resulted in his convictions or sentences.] Appellant has not demonstrated his entitlement to substitute court-appointed counsel in this matter. Appellant has neither sought nor been granted permission to file documents in proper person. The clerk shall return unfiled all proper person submissions received herein and counsel's October 4, 1999, response. Attorney Cornell shall remain as counsel for appellant. We grant the November 2, 1999, and December 1, 1999, motions for extensions of time. The clerk shall forthwith file the answering brief provisionally received on November 29, 1999. Appellant shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, file and serve the reply brief. 00-02933
02/24/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. 99-11816
02/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled with letter to attorney Cornell: original Response to Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney of Record and Transfer of Records received 10/04/00.
02/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled with letter to appellant Jensen: original proper person Notice of Motion/Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney of Record and Transfer of Records received 10/04/99; Response to Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney of Record and Transfer of Records received 10/18/00; Motion to Withdraw Motion to Relieve Attorney of Record and Motion of Reply to Counsels Motion received 11/08/99; and Motion for Order for Return of Property received 12/06/99.
03/27/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand dleivered 3/27/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-04871
08/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 9, 2000 at 11:00 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML)
09/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/22/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Pro Se Brief (Pro Se Brief Completed). RETURNED UNFILED 10/05/00. 00-16816
10/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On September 22, 2000, appellant's attorney of record, Richard F. Cornell, filed a motion for leave to file appellant's proper person brief, which was provisionally submitted on the same date. No good cause appearing, we deny appellant's motion of September 22, 2000. The clerk of this court shall forthwith return to appellant, unfiled, appellant's proper person brief. Our denial of the motion is without prejudice to appellant's right to file a motion, through counsel, seeking leave for counsel to file a supplemental brief. 00-17690
10/05/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Cornell: original Appellant's Pro Se Brief received September 22, 2000. (Detached from the motion filed September 22, 2000 and returned.)
10/09/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Northern Nevada Panel: NNP00A-MS/DA/ML.
12/21/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. "We vacate the portion of Jensen's conviction concerning sexual assault by anal intercourse against N. and affirm the judgment of conviction on the eight other counts." -NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. 00-22224
01/10/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 8, 2001, appellant submitted two proper person documents. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, we decline to grant him permission to proceed in proper person. The court has already issued an order affirming in part and reversing in part the judgment of conviction in this case. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person documents received on January 8, 2001. 01-00572
01/10/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Thomas Dean Jensen: returned unfiled, the original proper person Motion for Leave to file Notice and Motion to Dismiss Appeal Based Upon Ineffective Assistance of Counsel, received January 8, 2001.
01/16/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-22573
01/16/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2001. 00-22573