judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DEREK T. BELLAMY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0004)
Case Number:S-11-0004Case Docketed On:01/06/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:DEREK T. BELLAMY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DEREK T. BELLAMY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDerek T. BellamyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/06/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/22/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2011Order - Grant - extension of time to file Appellant's BriefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/11/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
04/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
04/12/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal