judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHARITA FLEMING V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1522
Short Caption:SHARITA FLEMING V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1581-10Filed Date:12/02/2010

Opening Event Date:12/02/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/06/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSharita Fleming YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Gaillard Hunt, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/15/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Gaillard Hunt, Esquire
12/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
12/22/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (attached to SRT)
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (5pgs/Tape) 7/6/10 proc. Part I
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (5pgs/Tape) 7/6/10 proc. Part II
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (4pgs/Tape) 7/27/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (7pgs/Tape) 9/23/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (5pgs/Tape) 10/25/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (77pgs/Rogers) 11/30/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (13pgs/Tape) 12/1/10 proc. w/CD
02/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/24/2011RECORD INDEX
02/24/2011RECORD COPIES
03/09/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/09/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
04/12/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/12/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/15/2011FiledLetter From - from counsel requesting the summary calendar date be changed in the event that oral argument is requested and granted. Counsel will be out of town from October 6th - October 11, 2011 (Appellant)
10/06/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Steadman
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
10/24/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for reh/reh en banc
02/14/2012FiledMandate
04/18/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
07/31/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
08/01/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
04/26/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE