judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9449
A-9449
02/11/1963
Application for Writ of Error
H. M. REED
T. W. BUCK, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/02/1963Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
07/25/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/15/1963Response to Reply filedRespondent
04/30/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/16/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
02/11/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/02/1963Brief in Support of Petition
07/29/1963Response to Motion filed
07/25/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/10/1963Opinion issued
05/15/1963Response to Reply filed
04/30/1963Reply to Response
04/16/1963Response to Petition
02/11/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/11/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. M. ReedPetitioner
T. W. Buck, Jr.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information