judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9452
A-9452
02/11/1963
Application for Writ of Error
WESTERN COMPANY, YOUNGSTOWN SHEET AND TUBE COMPANY, WESTERN COMPANY AND THE YOUNGSTOWN SHEET AND TUBE COMPANY
DAVID BERCHELMANN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/26/1963Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
07/22/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/09/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/28/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/25/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
02/11/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
02/11/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/26/1963Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
07/22/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/11/1963Response to Motion filed
07/09/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/28/1963Reply to Response
02/25/1963Response to Petition
02/11/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/11/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/11/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
David Berchelmann, et al.Respondent
Western CompanyPetitioner
Youngstown Sheet and Tube CompanyPetitioner
Western Company and the Youngstown Sheet and Tube CompanyPetitioner
Petroleum Equipment Suppliers AssociationAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information