judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PETERSON VS. DALY HOMES

Case Information: 33506
Short Caption:PETERSON VS. DALY HOMESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A367784Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Claiborne, HarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/23/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Cuthbert E.A. Mack--check no. 4849.
12/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00489
12/23/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
12/30/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00563
12/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 12/28/98. 98-00568
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Harry Claiborne. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/15/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-01836
03/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-02017
07/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days of this order, file and serve the transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request, or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed. 99-06228
11/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has failed to comply with the above-referenced orders. " . . . we hereby dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-11229
12/13/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12465
12/13/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/22/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 1999. 99-12465