judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9475
A-9475
02/18/1963
MISC PETITION
STATE OF TEXAS
HON. OWEN GILES, J. B. LAPSLEY AND WIFE, ALLIE N. LAPSLEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/12/1963Supplement to ResponseRespondent
04/08/1963Response to Reply filedRespondent
04/03/1963Reply to ResponseRelator
04/01/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
03/29/1963Brief on the MeritsRelator
03/26/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
03/15/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/18/1963Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/17/1963Order from Lower Court filed
07/02/1963Response to Motion filed
06/12/1963Opinion issued
04/12/1963Supplement to Response
04/08/1963Response to Reply filed
04/03/1963Reply to Response
04/01/1963Response to Petition
03/29/1963Brief on the Merits
03/26/1963Response to Petition
03/15/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/19/1963Order from Lower Court filed
02/18/1963Brief in Support of Petition
02/18/1963Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Owen GilesRespondent
J. B. Lapsley and wife, Allie N. LapsleyRespondent
Dallas County, TexasAmicus Curiae
State of TexasRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information