judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9484
A-9484
03/04/1963
Application for Writ of Error
VERNA KATHERYN SARTAIN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF HER MINOR CHILDREN, KATHY SARTAIN AND JANIE SARTAIN
SOUTHERN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/27/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/15/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/04/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/15/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
03/04/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/27/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/15/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/04/1963Reply to Response
03/15/1963Response to Petition
03/04/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledOverruled
03/04/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southern National Life Insurance CompanyRespondent
Carl Runge, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Verna Katheryn Sartain, individually and as Next Friend of her minor Children, Kathy Sartain and Janie SartainPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information