judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9502
A-9502
03/14/1963
Application for Writ of Error
A. T. BAUCUM
GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/03/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/27/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
03/19/1963Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/14/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/02/1963Opinion issued
06/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/03/1963Reply to Response
03/27/1963Response to Petition
03/19/1963Brief in Support of Petition
03/14/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/14/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A. T. BaucumPetitioner
Great American Insurance Company of New YorkRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information