judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (TONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33507
Short Caption:SMITH (TONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 72140 , 72140-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C151826Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/11/2000 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:12/11/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/23/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00490
01/29/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Patricia M. Erickson. (Fast track notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-00633
02/02/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to all counsel. Pursuant to NRAP 3C(a)(1) this is not a fast track appeal (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant).
02/05/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 07/28/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson (mailed on: 02/03/99). 99-00843
02/05/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 07/20/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald (mailed on 02/03/99). 99-00844
02/05/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 09/29/98 and 10/20/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Roger Calabrese (mailed on: 02/03/99). 99-00845
02/05/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 10/02/98; 11/17/98; 12/03/98; and 12/04/98. Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Diann Prock (mailed on: 02/03/99). 99-00846
02/05/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 10/22/98; 11/30/98; 12/01/98; 12/02/98; and 01/20/99 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell (mailed on: 02/03/99). 99-00847
02/09/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Mailed on: FedEx 2/8/99. 99-00895
02/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 07/20/98 Proceedings. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 99-00969
03/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order due: 30 days. 99-01505
03/10/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Arraignment-7/28/98. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 99-01702
03/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: 02/10/99. 99-01724
04/07/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 10/02/98; 11/17/98; 12/03/98; 12/04/98; 01/27/99 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 99-02591
04/08/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/22/98, 11/30/98, 12/1/98, 12/2/98. Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. 99-02676
04/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-02702
04/14/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The appellant's opning brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before July 21, 999. 99-02871
07/15/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-06349
07/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 30, 1999. 99-06395
08/30/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-08107
09/10/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-08534
09/21/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Mailed on 9/20/99--FedEx. 99-08961
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief and appendix due: on or before October 20, 1999. Therafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). No further extension of time shall be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Failure to file the opening brief and appendix within the time proscribed by this order will likely result in the imposition of sanctions. 99-09574
10/25/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Application for Permission to File Opening Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. 99-10413
10/25/1999BriefReceived Opening Brief. 99-10415
11/04/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The fifty-three page opening brief and appendix provisionally submitted on October 25, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-10838
11/04/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 10/20/99. 99-10415
11/04/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-10416
11/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief. 99-11005
01/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant respondent's unopposed motion. The clerk shall forthwith strike appellant's opening brief. Attorney Erickson shall have 20 days to file and serve an amended opening brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date appellant files the amended opening brief to file respondent's answering brief. (Opening brief filed 11/04/99-STRICKEN). 00-01309
02/18/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Application for Persmission to File Amended Opening Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. 00-02623
03/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall, forthwith, file the 57 page amended opening brief provisionally received on February 18, 2000. 00-03457
03/06/2000BriefFiled Amended Brief. Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. Mailed on 02/15/00. 00-02624
03/17/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-04234
03/17/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-04236
04/18/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 19, 2000. 00-06151
05/19/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-08432
05/23/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before June 23, 2000. 00-08609
06/28/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 6/23/00. 00-11063
10/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 11, 2000 at 11:00 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML)
11/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/11/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP00A-MS/DA/ML
01/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-01975
02/12/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (Patricia M. Erickson). 01-02788
02/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02066
02/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/02/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Amended. Attorney Patricia Erickson. 01-03848
03/22/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. 01-02066
09/04/2008Other Returned Mail. Docket sheet 8/21/08 to Tony Smith. Address updated per NDOC and remailed. 08-22731