judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANCIS XAVIER GUERRERO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0263)
Case Number:S-10-0263Case Docketed On:12/17/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:FRANCIS XAVIER GUERRERO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FRANCIS XAVIER GUERRERO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerFrancis Xavier GuerreroDiane Elizabeth Courselle
Brian Quinn
RespondentThe State of WyomingD. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie
Gregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 77
Citation:277 P.3d 735

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/17/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/17/2010Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
12/17/2010Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
01/04/2011Order - Other - Order denying petition for writ of review and order granting, in part, petition for writ of certiorari.OrderOtherFinal
03/09/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Findings of fact and conclusions of law on Remand for Petition for Writ of CertiorariRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesFindings of fact and conclusions of lawFinal
03/22/2011Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
03/30/2011Record - Other - Copies of District Court pleadings including request for Court Reporter to prepare transcripts.RecordOtherFinal
04/12/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Order Granting Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma PauperisRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
06/01/2011Event - Phone Call to District Court re record completion, Court Reporter has requested a short extension until 06/13/2011.EventPhone CallFinal
06/03/2011Record - Other - Order allowing Court Reporter an extension of time to file transcriptsRecordOtherFinal
06/17/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
06/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/26/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - motion for extension to file brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/27/2011Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellant.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/20/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/21/2011Order - Grant - extension of time to file Appellant's briefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent of ClientNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
10/14/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Consent of Client for Brian D. Quinn to appear and Designation of Record on Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/28/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits; Volume VI, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/09/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Brian Quinn, Student, for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/11/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane E. Courselle, Director, DAP and Brian Quinn, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Quinn for appellant; Justin A. Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/11/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/31/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/31/2012Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant, he is on probation therefore, certified copy not sent to institution.EventPhone CallFinal
06/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/18/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/18/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/19/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/20/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/19/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal