judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEBRA JOHNSON V. D.C. OFFICE OF TAX AND REVENUE

Case Information: 10-AA-1503
Short Caption:DEBRA JOHNSON V. D.C. OFFICE OF TAX AND REVENUEClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Tax & Revenue
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:OTR00004-10Filed Date:12/06/2010

Opening Event Date:12/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/20/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDebra JohnsonNPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Office of Tax and RevenueN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonNY
Gregory M. CummingNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/06/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/06/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/07/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
12/15/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
06/17/2011RECORD ON APPEAL ** No Hearing was held .. No Transcript attached).
06/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/23/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
07/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)
08/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) until 11/2/2011
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
12/06/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) - 1/03/2012
01/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
01/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) - 3/5/2012
03/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner)Granted
03/29/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Petitioner) - 5/7/12
05/07/2012FiledBrief (Appendix attached) (Petitioner)
05/07/2012FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
05/09/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Other (Petitioner)Granted
05/25/2012FiledOrder Granting motion to supplement the brief
05/25/2012FiledSupplement to Brief (Petitioner)
06/07/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)
07/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 8/10/12
08/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until October 9, 2012 (Respondent)Granted
08/28/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until October 9, 2012 (Respondent) - 10/9/12
10/09/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Respondent)Denied
10/09/2012FiledAppendix to respondent's motion for summary affirmance (Respondent)
10/11/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/23/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and DIRECTING RESPONDENT'S BRIEF W/N 30 DAYS
02/04/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
03/05/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) - 4/23/13
04/23/2013FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)Granted
04/26/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Respondent)
04/26/2013FiledDismissed
05/20/2013FiledMandate