judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-1254
B-1254
12/16/1968
Application for Writ of Error
ZOLLIE OWENS
RUBY LYLES ROGERS, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/19/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/21/1969Post submission brief filedRespondent
02/13/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/02/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
12/16/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/25/1969Response to Motion filed
11/19/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/05/1969Opinion issued
04/21/1969Post submission brief filed
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/19/1969Response to Motion filed
02/13/1969Motion for RehearingFiling granted
01/02/1969Response to Petition
12/16/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/16/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Zollie OwensPetitioner
Ruby Lyles Rogers, et virRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information