judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9481
A-9481
02/28/1963
Application for Writ of Error
H. S. GREEN, A. B. CANNING, WILLIAM T. GREEN, EARL M. MOORE AND E.M. MOORE INVESTMENT COMPANY
H.R. WEISSBERG CORPORATION, A.R. CLARK INVESTMENT COMPANY, A. R. CLARK AND BILLIE CLARK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/12/1964Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/16/1963Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/23/1963Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/21/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/13/1963Response to PetitionPetitioner
03/13/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
02/28/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
02/28/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/18/1964Response to Motion filed
02/12/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/29/1964Dissenting opinion issued.
01/29/1964Opinion issued
08/16/1963Supplemental Brief filed
07/23/1963Brief on the Merits
06/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1963Document received (See Remarks)
03/21/1963Reply to Response
03/15/1963Document received (See Remarks)
03/13/1963Response to Petition
03/13/1963Response to Petition
02/28/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/28/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/28/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A.R. Clark Investment Company, A. R. Clark and Billie ClarkRespondent
H. S. Green, A. B. Canning, William T. Green, Earl M. Moore and E.M. Moore Investment CompanyPetitioner
H.R. Weissberg CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information