judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00136-CR
10-81-00136-CR
10/01/1981
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Lawrence Melvin Billetter
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/1982Case stored
07/14/1982Mandate issued by this Court
05/13/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1982Submitted
10/01/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
296697
Life