judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-81-00174-CR
13-81-00174-CR
09/30/1981
Theft
Moron, Joe & Frank Moron
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/29/1986Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
04/29/1986Mandate Issued
04/15/1986ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
04/09/1986Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/12/1986ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
02/12/1986Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/1986ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
01/29/1986Mot. for leave to file motion for rehear DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Denied
11/06/1985Higher Court DecisionAff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct
10/07/1982Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
04/29/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/14/1982Submission
01/14/1982Submitted
10/26/1981Case ready to be set
09/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Calhoun
Honorable Ronald Yeager
81-2-2673A&B
$1,500 fine & 1 yr Prob