judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00299-CV
04-81-00299-CV
09/30/1981
Other Personal Injury
Knotts, Timothy C.
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/28/1983Mandate Issued
11/28/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
11/23/1983Mandate Issued
11/02/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
09/29/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
09/21/1983Writ of Error filed
08/22/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/11/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1983Submission
01/25/1983Case ready to be set
01/25/1983Submission
01/25/1983Submitted
10/04/1982Requests Oral Argument
10/04/1982Case ready to be set
12/09/1981Brief Filed
11/16/1981Brief Filed
11/12/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/30/1981Deposition Filed
09/30/1981No Description Available.
09/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
25th Judicial District Court
Guadalupe
Honorable B. B. Schraub
79-810
n/a