judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DURWOOD O. PHILLIPS, ET UX. v. BILL C. LATHAM

Case: B-1259
B-1259
12/18/1968
Application for Writ of Error
DURWOOD O. PHILLIPS, ET UX.
BILL C. LATHAM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/06/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/10/1969Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
01/09/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/08/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
12/18/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/06/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/10/1969Supplement to Petition filed
01/09/1969Reply to Response
01/08/1969Response to Petition
12/18/1968Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/18/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bill C. LathamRespondent
Durwood O. Phillips, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information