judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TORRES (AMANCIO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33499
Short Caption:TORRES (AMANCIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C142122Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/21/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/21/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00462
12/31/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. 06/12/98; 12/16/98; and 12/10/98Proceedings: Court Reporter: James A. Helleso. 98-00588
01/13/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: January 26, 1999. 99-00246
01/26/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Fourteen Page Fast Track Statement (mailed by express mail). 99-00519
02/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the 14 page fast track statement and appendix received on January 26, 1999. 99-00747
02/03/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00520
02/03/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-00521
02/11/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 14 Page Fast Track Response. 99-00958
02/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the 14 page fast track response received on February 11, 1999. 99-01144
02/19/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-00959
06/01/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-04495
06/29/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-05689
06/29/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/21/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 1999. 99-05689